+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 5, 2006 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/5/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/4 CHAPTER 100 SLA 06
On July 24, 2006 in the House:
- 10:45 AM 7/18/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 304(FIN) AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 304(FIN) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2006
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, BUNDE, STEDMAN
- FN3: (CED)
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON, DYSON
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN3: (CED)
- DP: STEVENS B
- NR: WAGONER, ELTON, DYSON, STEDMAN
- RES RPT 4NR 1DP
On April 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 24, 2006 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y21 N13 E2 A4
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y38 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 304(FIN) AM
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 304(FIN) AM
On April 21, 2006 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- AM: KERTTULA
- NR: HOLM, MOSES, CHENAULT;
- DP: FOSTER, KELLY, MEYER;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 3NR 1AM
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- DP: ELKINS, RAMRAS;
- RES RPT CS(RES) 2DP 1DNP 3NR 1AM
- AM: GATTO
- DNP: SEATON;
- NR: OLSON, KAPSNER, CRAWFORD;
- FN1: (CED)
On March 24, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: HARRIS, KAPSNER, WILSON
- DP: ELKINS, THOMAS;
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 2DP 3NR
On May 7, 2005 in the House:
- FSH, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor