+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284
- FN1: (DPS)
On April 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN
- FN1: (DPS)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, GIESSEL
- FN1: (DPS)
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 304
- PASSED Y31 E9
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, OLSON, KERTTULA, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 304
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- FIN RPT 11DP
- DP: T.WILSON, GARA, FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON,
- DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN1: (DPS)
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON, STOLTZE, COSTELLO
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- STA RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: P.WILSON, GRUENBERG, SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN
- NR: KELLER
- FN1: (DPS)
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor