+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (80)
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (H)
On May 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURNED TO (H)
On May 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME 2D CSHB 303(RLS)
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 1 FLD Y7 N13
- FAILED PASSAGE Y2 N18
- WILKEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- 5/14 CAL NOT TAKEN UP- ON 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 5DNP 4NR
- DNP: DONLEY, GREEN, WILKEN, WARD, LEMAN
- NR: KELLY, OLSON, HOFFMAN, AUSTERMAN
- FN2: (REV)
- REFERRED TO RULES W/NO DO PASS Y11 N9
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4OR 5/13/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO 3RD READING FLD Y12 N7 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DNP 1AM
- DNP: THERRIAULT, PHILLIPS, STEVENS;
- AM: DAVIS
- FN2: (REV)
On May 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On May 2, 2002 in the House:
- RLS RPT 2D CS(RLS) NT 2DP 1DNP 4NR
- DP: JOULE, PORTER; DNP: KOHRING;
- NR: MORGAN, MCGUIRE, KOTT, BERKOWITZ
- FN2: (REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/02
- IN SECOND READING
- RESCIND ACTION ADPTING FIN CS UC
- 2D CS RLS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y11 N26 E1 A2
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y10 N29 E1
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y14 N25 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME 2D CSHB 303(RLS)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 7 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 7 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y24 N15 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 N5 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: 2D CSHB 303(RLS)
On March 27, 2002 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N32 E1
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM 2 TO AM 2 AS AM FAILED Y17 N22 E1
- AM 3 TO AM 2 AS AM OFFERED
- TECH AM 1 TO AM 3 TO AM 2 AS AM UC
- TECH AM 2 TO AM 3 TO AM 2 AS AM
- FAILED Y17 N22 E1
- AM 3 TO AM 2 AS AM FLD Y15 N24 E1
- AM 4 TO AM 2 AS AM OFFERED
- TECH AM 1 TO AM 4 TO AM 2 AS AM
- ADOPTED Y23 N13 E1 A3
- TECH AM 2 TO AM 4 TO AM 2 AS AM
- RULED OUT OF ORDER
- AM 4 TO AM 2 AS AM FAILED Y15 N23 E1 A1
- AM 2 AS AM FAILED Y17 N22 E1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y7 N31 E1 A1
- HELD IN SECOND READING
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On March 26, 2002 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 5DNP 2NR
- DP: BUNDE, WHITAKER, LANCASTER, MULDER;
- DNP: CROFT, DAVIES, MOSES, HUDSON,
- FOSTER; NR: HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- FN2: (REV)
On March 15, 2002 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 2DP 4DNP 1NR
- DP: STEVENS, FATE; DNP: WILSON,
- CRAWFORD, JAMES, HAYES; NR: COGHILL
- FN1: (REV)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LANCASTER
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FATE
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/02
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN