+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
- NR: MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- REFERRED TO RULES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N23 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 302(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y33 N3 A2 E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 302(FIN) AM
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, COSTELLO, EDGMON, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- NR: DOOGAN
- AM: FAIRCLOUGH
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, GARA
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS, MUNOZ
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor