+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On July 9, 2010 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/10
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 42 SLA 10
- 2:51 PM 5/12/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- LETTER TO AMHTA PER AS 37.14.005(C)
On April 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC RPT ADPTD Y20 N- CCS HB 302
- CC REPORT READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 18, 2010 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC RPT ADPTD Y39 A1 CCS HB 302
- CC REPORT: CCS HB 302
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- HOFFMAN(CHAIR), STEDMAN, THOMAS
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N20
- RECEDE MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- HAWKER (CHAIR), STOLTZE, GARA
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N37 E3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 302(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y20 N-
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- ENGROSSED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 3/30 CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 302(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2010
On March 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS
- FIN RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 302(FIN)
- PASSED Y40
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 302(FIN)
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- HAWKER
- DP: KELLY, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, DOOGAN, GARA, JOULE, SALMON, THOMAS, STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor