+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- 2:48 PM 5/15/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 31 SLA 12
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 301(L&C)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 301(L&C)
On April 15, 2012 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS (L&C) 5DP 1NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: (DNR)
On April 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, EGAN, MENARD, OLSON, WAGONER, DYSON,
- STEVENS
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, MENARD
- FN1: (DNR)
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y30 E9 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 301(FIN)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 301(FIN)
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- JOHANSEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, KELLER, FEIGE, MUNOZ, JOHNSON, MILLETT, JOHANSEN, TUCK
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, COSTELLO
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, JOULE, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON,
- STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN1: (DNR)
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- L&C RPT 7DP
- DP: CHENAULT, THOMPSON, SADDLER, JOHNSON, HOLMES, MILLER, OLSON
- FN1: (DNR)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor