+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 30(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y35 N2 E3
- PASSED Y25 N12 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 30(FIN)
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2020
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, LEDOUX
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CALENDAR
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- DNP: CARPENTER
- DP: ORTIZ, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 1DNP 5NR
- NR: TILTON, LEBON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOHNSTON
- FN3: (ADM)
- FN4: (LWF)
- FN5: (LWF)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- FN2: (LWF)
- FN1: (ADM)
- NR: REVAK, TALERICO
- DP: HANNAN, FIELDS, STUTES, WOOL, LEDOUX
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 2NR
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/19