+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- 11:15 A.M. 7/7/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 33 SLA 22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/22
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N1 E1
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 26
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 297(HSS)(TITLE AM) AM S
- PASSED Y17 N- A3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, MYERS, STEVENS, BISHOP
- HOLLAND
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSHB 297(HSS)(TITLE AM) AM S
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: SHOWER, KAWASAKI, HOLLAND, COSTELLO
- FN1: ZERO(DHS/DFC)
- HSS REFERRAL WAIVED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, BEGICH, COSTELLO, HUGHES, MICCICHE
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, HSS
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N33 E4
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y2 N34 E4
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y3 N33 E4
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y1 N35 E4
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y4 N32 E4
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 297(HSS)(TITLE AM)
- PASSED Y33 N3 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY, TARR, JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 297(HSS)(TITLE AM)
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- SESSION CANCELED 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR
- SESSION CANCELED 3/30 - ON 3/31 CALENDAR
- TECHNICAL SESSION 3/31 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- ADJOURNED TO 3/29 CALENDAR
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2022
- SESSION CANCELED 3/23 - ON 3/24 CALENDAR
- TECHNICAL SESSION 3/24 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) 5DP 2NR
- DP: MCCARTY, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER
- NR: KURKA, PRAX
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NELSON
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP
- DP: CLAMAN, TARR, STORY, NELSON, SHAW, TUCK
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV, HSS
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor