+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 24, 2000 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/21 CHAPTER 18 SLA 00
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 4/22/00
On April 14, 2000 in the House:
- 3:55 PM 4/13/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 4/10/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ 3RD TIME CSHB 297(STA)(TITLE AM)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On April 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: MILLER, PEARCE, PETE KELLY;
- NR: WILKEN, ELTON
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
On March 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- READ THIRD TIME CSHB 297(STA)(TITLE AM)
- PASSED Y35 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 22, 2000 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/23 CALENDAR
On March 21, 2000 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
On March 17, 2000 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 2DP 3NR
- DP: JAMES, HUDSON; NR: SMALLEY,
- KERTTULA, WHITAKER
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) 4AM
- AM: GREEN, DYSON, COGHILL, BRICE
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HES
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES