+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/9 CHAPTER 12 SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/8/98
On March 26, 1998 in the House:
- 8:50 AM 3/26/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 296
- PASSED Y15 N- E5
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP
- DP: SHARP, PHILLIPS, PARNELL, ADAMS,
- TORGERSON, DONLEY
- (H) ZERO FN (DCED)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DUNCAN, LEMAN,
- SHARP, MILLER
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 296
- PASSED Y33 E6 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- RES RPT 6DP
- DP: DYSON, WILLIAMS, GREEN, MASEK,
- HUDSON, JOULE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
On January 12, 1998 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/2/98
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES