+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT CS(ENE) NT 8DP 2NR
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, JOULE, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, N.FOSTER, SALMON, FAIRCLOUGH
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(DOT)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2010
- NR: DOOGAN, HAWKER
- ENE CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 296(ENE)
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 296(ENE)
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- ENE RPT CS(ENE) NT 3DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: PETERSEN, EDGMON, MILLETT
- AM: TUCK
- NR: DAHLSTROM, JOHANSEN
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(DOT)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN2: ZERO(DOT)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- ENE, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor