+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 7, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/30/94
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/6 CHAPTER 27 SLA 94
On May 2, 1994 in the House:
- 2:45 PM 5/2/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 28, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 294(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/94
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DCED)
- FIN RPT 6DP (L&C)SCS TECH TITLE CHANGE
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- UPDATED ZERO FN TO HB & SCS (DCED)
- L&C RPT SCS 3DP 2NR TECH TITLE CHANGE
On April 27, 1993 in the Senate:
- L&C, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 26, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 294
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/93
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 4/26/93
- DP: SANDERS, MOSES
- DP: CARNEY, ULMER, BARNES, PHILLIPS
- RLS RPT 6DP
On April 23, 1993 in the House:
- RULES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)