+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (58)
On July 9, 2010 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/5/10
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 47 SLA 10
- 2:06 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- RET 2ND/RESCIND ACTION ADOPTING FIN SCS UC
- REQUESTED RETURN OF BILL FROM HOUSE
- VERSION: CSHB 294(FIN)
- RESCIND PASSING SCS CSHB 294(FIN) Y20 N-
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On April 18, 2010 in the House:
- RETURNED TO SENATE PER REQUEST UC
On April 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- RESCIND ACTION ADOPTING FIN SCS UC
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- WITHDRAW MOTION TO ADOPT FIN SCS UC
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- BILL RECEIVED IN SENATE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- AUTOMATICALLY IN 3RD READING CSHB 294(FIN)
On April 17, 2010 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 294(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 294(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 23
- FIN RPT SCS 7DP NEW TITLE
- FN1: (DNR)
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 294(FIN)
- PASSED Y40
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- T.WILSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, P.WILSON, TUCK, JOHNSON, GARDNER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 294(FIN)
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 1NR
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, SALMON, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE
- NR: KELLY
- FN1: (DNR)
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BUCH, OLSON, CHENAULT, HOLMES, T.WILSON
- FN1: (DNR)
- DP: LYNN, BUCH, NEUMAN, CHENAULT, HOLMES, T.WILSON, OLSON
- L&C RPT 7DP
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor