+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (63)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 3:46 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 105 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y24 N14 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y40
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y25 N11 A4
- RESCIND FAILING EFD Y38 N2
- RESCIND CONCUR FAILED Y18 N22
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 29(JUD)
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 29(JUD)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
On May 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS; NR: FRENCH, OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS 1DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- NR: BUNDE, STEVENS G;
- DP: SEEKINS; AM: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 29(JUD) AM
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N21 E3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y17 N20 E3
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y27 N8 E3 A2
- AM NO 3 AS AM WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y23 N12 E3 A2
- AM NO 5 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 29(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y29 N8 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROFT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
- DP: SAMUELS, ANDERSON, OGG, MCGUIRE;
- NR: GARA, GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP 1NR
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, GATTO, ROKEBERG,
- DAHLSTROM, ANDERSON; NR: GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor