+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
- DP: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS, AUSTERMAN
- CRA RPT 3DP
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- CRA, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- VERSION: SSHB 289 AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 289 AM
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/27 CALENDAR
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
- MURKOWSKI, MORGAN
- DP: MEYER; NR: GUESS, KERTTULA,
- CRA RPT 1DP 4NR
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/02
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor