+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- BILL ENGROSSED ON 4/19/16
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- FIN SCS ADOPTED Y18 N2
- FIN RPT SCS 1DP 6NR NEW TITLE
On April 17, 2016 in the House:
- WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR UC
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- DP: OLSON
- NR: KELLY, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN
- FN2: ZERO(S.FIN/CED)
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN SECOND READING
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 27
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y14 N6
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 289(FIN) AM S
- PASSED Y15 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 289(FIN) AM S
On April 17, 2016 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 289
- PASSED Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, JOSEPHSON
- VERSION: HB 289
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: TILTON, KITO, JOSEPHSON, COLVER, OLSON
- DP: LEDOUX, HUGHES
- L&C RPT 2DP 5NR
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS