+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (64)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 10:50 PM 6/3/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 47 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/2/04
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N8
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 288(STA)
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 288(STA)
- FAILED PASSAGE Y10 N9 E1
- STEVENS B NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS(STA) 2DP 3NR
- NR: BUNDE, SEEKINS, FRENCH; DP: DAVIS,
- STEVENS G
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 20
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- DP: STEVENS G, STEDMAN; NR: GUESS
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, L&C
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- RLS RPT 2D CS(RLS) NT 2DP 1DNP 2NR
- DP: COGHILL, ROKEBERG; DNP: KERTTULA;
- NR: MCGUIRE, KOTT
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- RULES TO CALENDAR IN THIRD 1/21/04
- RET 2ND/RESCIND ADOPTING CS(STA) UC
- RESCIND ADOPTING CS(STA) UC
- 2D CS(RLS) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 E4
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: 2D CSHB 288(RLS)
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 288(STA)
- PASSED Y21 N11 E3 A5
- KAPSNER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- CRA RPT CS(STA) NT 2DP 3NR
- DP: WOLF, KOTT; NR: SAMUELS, CISSNA,
- MORGAN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 1NR 2AM
- DP: GATTO, DAHLSTROM, LYNN;
- NR: ROKEBERG; AM: CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: DAHLSTROM, LYNN, HOLM;
- DNP: BERKOWITZ; NR: SEATON, GRUENBERG,
- WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- CRA REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, L&C
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor