+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 21, 2020 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 2NR
- DP: DRUMMOND, KOPP, CLAMAN
- NR: SHAW, VANCE
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DPS)
- FN2: (CED)
- FN3: (DPS)
- FN4: (DPS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: SHAW
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- TRB RPT CS(TRB) 4DP 1NR
- DP: KOPP, LINCOLN, ORTIZ, ZULKOSKY
- NR: VANCE
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DPS)
- FN2: (CED)
- FN3: (DPS)
- FN4: (DPS)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRB, JUD, FIN