+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 10, 2008 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 78 SLA 08
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/4/08
On June 6, 2008 in the House:
- 3:26 PM 6/4/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- MCGUIRE, STEDMAN
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 286(JUD)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, BUNDE, WAGONER, STEVENS, FRENCH, DYSON, THOMAS,
- PASSED Y20 N-
- MCGUIRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 286(JUD)
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
On April 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: FRENCH, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 1DP 2NR
- DP: MCGUIRE
- NR: STEVENS, FRENCH
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- PASSED Y37 E3
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/11/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 286
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- DAHLSTROM NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, JOHNSON, OLSON, ROSES, WILSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 286
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- AM: HOLMES
- NR: COGHILL
- DP: SAMUELS, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/08
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor