+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/15/12
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:06 PM 5/11/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 18 SLA 12
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/15/12
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 286(FIN)
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 286(FIN)
On April 15, 2012 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A1 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN2: (REV)
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 286(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 N1 V1
- VERSION: CSHB 286(FIN)
- STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N1 A2 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: (REV)
- NR: DOOGAN
- THOMAS
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP 1NR
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor