+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- 11:18 AM 5/17/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/18 CHAPTER 31 SLA 95
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/19/95
On May 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 2DP 1DNP 3NR
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING Y18 N2
On May 16, 1995 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) FN (REV)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 286(FIN)
- PASSED Y13 N7
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y18 N2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 16, 1995 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y27 N12 A1
On May 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/95
On May 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
On May 4, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/04/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N29
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y19 N21
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y14 N26
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y5 N35
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y5 N35
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 286(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y32 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PORTER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- HOLD RECON TO 5/5 CAL FLD Y10 N25 A5
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N9 A5
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y34 N6
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 21, 1995 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 1DNP 4NR
- DP: HANLEY, BROWN, FOSTER
- DNP: MARTIN
- NR: KOHRING, GRUSSENDORF, KELLY
- NR: THERRIAULT
- FISCAL NOTE (REV) 4/6/95
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- JUD RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: PORTER, VEZEY, FINKELSTEIN, B.DAVIS
- DP: BUNDE, TOOHEY
- NR: GREEN
- FISCAL NOTE (REV)
On March 28, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor