+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- NR: PHILLIPS
- DNP: THERRIAULT; DP: STEVENS, DAVIS;
- STA RPT 2DP 1DNP 1NR
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- OLSON
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, DAVIS, ELTON
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, LEMAN, ELLIS
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/23/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 285
- COSPONSOR(S): JOULE, MULDER, CISSNA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 285
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HAYES, CRAWFORD
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- HAYES, COGHILL
- DP: WILSON, STEVENS, JAMES, FATE,
- STA RPT 6DP
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, CHENAULT
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/02
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor