+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 3:46 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 110 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/04
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 285(JUD)
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 285(JUD)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 1DP 4NR
- DP: SEEKINS; NR: FRENCH, ELLIS,
- THERRIAULT, OGAN
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS; NR: FRENCH,
- STEVENS G
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 285(JUD)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 285(JUD)
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 7DP
- DP: SAMUELS, HOLM, GARA, OGG,
- GRUENBERG, ANDERSON, MCGUIRE
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT 2DP 4NR
- DP: LYNN, ANDERSON; NR: GATTO,
- CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG, DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/ALL DEPTS)
On April 25, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD