+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 9:15 AM 6/10/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 91 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/03
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 283
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 283
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, SEEKINS,
- DYSON, TAYLOR, STEVENS B, COWDERY,
- OLSON, WILKEN, GREEN
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B,
- WAGONER, DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 283
- PASSED Y34 N1 E3 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 283
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 7DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, HEINZE, MORGAN, MASEK,
- WOLF, FATE
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE, HOLM, WOLF,
- WHITAKER
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor