+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN3: (CED)
- FN2: (DHS)
- NR: HOLMES, CISSNA, HERRON
- DP: SEATON, KELLER
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) 2DP 3NR
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: BUCH
- NR: T.WILSON, HOLMES, OLSON
- DNP: LYNN
- FN1: (CED)
- FN2: (DHS)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- JUD REFERRAL REMOVED
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- L&C, HSS, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor