+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (72)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- 2:30 P.M. 6/15/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- LETTER TO AMHTA PER AS 37.14.005(C) RECEIVED
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 12 SLA 22
- LINE-ITEM VETO AND REDUCTIONS
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- LEG FIN MESSAGE & FNS TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR 9/1/22
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT TAKEN UP
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- CC REPORT READ AND HELD
- FISCAL NOTE PACKET
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT READ
- PRECEDENCE SET TO TAKE UP
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- CC REPORT: CCS HB 282 RECEIVED 5/18/22 12:32 A.M.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CC RPT ADPTD Y20 N- CCS HB 282
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- CC RPT ADOPTED Y35 N5 CCS HB 282
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 N6
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT: CCS HB 282 RECEIVED 5/18/22 12:32 A.M.
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4
- PRECEDENCE SET TO TAKE UP, SUSTAIN RULING OF CHAIR Y38 N2
- CC REPORT TAKEN UP UC
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N14 E2 A4
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N36 E1 A3
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- MERRICK (CHAIR), ORTIZ, LEBON
On May 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- STEDMAN (CHAIR), BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 282(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 282(FIN) AM S
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/9 - ON 5/10 CALENDAR
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: BISHOP, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN
- NR: WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CAL
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 282(FIN)
- PASSED Y27 N12 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 282(FIN)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
- SPREAD IN JOURNAL ALL AMS NOT OFFERED, RULED OUT OF ORDER
- SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y30 N2 E3 A5
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/7 CALENDAR
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/6 CALENDAR
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 3DP 7NR
- DP: EDGMON, FOSTER, MERRICK
- NR: ORTIZ, LEBON, CARPENTER, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED Y23 N12 E4 A1
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/5 CALENDAR
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor