+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- 2:30 PM 8/7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 8/30 CH 115 SLA 14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/28/14
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E2
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y18 N1 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 281(L&C) AM S
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, GIESSEL, MEYER, BISHOP, EGAN, DYSON, KELLY
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSHB 281(L&C) AM S
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/23/14
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/23 - ON 4/24 CALENDAR
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP
- DP: DUNLEAVY, OLSON, MICCICHE
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT 1DP 3NR
- DP: KELLY
- NR: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, ELLIS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, L&C
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 281(L&C)
- PASSED Y36 N3 A1
- KAWASAKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, STOLTZE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 281(L&C)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 4NR
- DP: CHENAULT, OLSON
- NR: HERRON, JOHNSON, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) 4DP
- DP: SEATON, PRUITT, KELLER, HIGGINS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, L&C
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor