+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On August 14, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/02
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/27 CHAPTER 88 SLA 02
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- 9:59 AM 6/17/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DONLEY, TAYLOR,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 281(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- DAVIS, ELLIS, LINCOLN, ELTON, COWDERY
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 281(JUD)
On April 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
- DP: TAYLOR, COWDERY; NR: THERRIAULT
- JUD RPT 2DP 1NR
On March 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
- NR: AUSTERMAN
- DP: STEVENS, DAVIS, LEMAN, TORGERSON;
- L&C RPT 4DP 1NR
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MURKOWSKI
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 281(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/02
- VERSION: CSHB 281(JUD)
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 3NR
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
- DP: MEYER, OGAN, ROKEBERG;
- NR: BERKOWITZ, COGHILL, KOOKESH
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
- MURKOWSKI; NR: CRAWFORD
- DP: ROKEBERG, MEYER, KOTT, HALCRO,
- L&C RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/02
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor