+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HALCRO
On April 26, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On April 22, 1999 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP
- DP: CROFT, GREEN, KOTT, KERTTULA
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- HES REFERRAL WAIVED
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/99
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, JUD, FIN