+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 2:20 PM 6/10/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 72 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/12/03
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 28(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSSHB 28(FIN)
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR
- NR: WILKEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON;
- DP: GREEN, TAYLOR, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN2: (DNR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/21 CALENDAR
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP
- DP: OGAN, WAGONER, STEVENS B, SEEKINS
- FN2: (DNR)
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 5NR
- DP: MEYER, CHENAULT, HARRIS, WILLIAMS;
- NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE, KERTTULA, MOSES,
- BERKOWITZ
- FN2: (DNR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 28(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): MASEK, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 28(FIN)
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 5DP 2NR
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, MORGAN, HEINZE, FATE;
- NR: KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) 6DP 1AM
- DP: CHENAULT, MCGUIRE, ROKEBERG,
- CRAWFORD, FATE, KOHRING; AM: KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- O&G, RES, FIN
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- O&G, RES, FIN