+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 27, 2011 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/27 CHAPTER 25 SLA 11
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On June 24, 2011 in the House:
- 10:25 AM 6/10/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 10
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, COSTELLO, FAIRCLOUGH, PRUITT
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 28(L&C)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, GIESSEL, MEYER, ELLIS, MENARD, PASKVAN,
- EGAN, DAVIS, MCGUIRE, THOMAS, WAGONER
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 28(L&C)
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- BILL REPRINTED 4/4/11
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 10
- DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, L&C
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 28(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, KERTTULA, CHENAULT, LYNN, PETERSEN, MILLETT, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 28(FIN)
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON,
- DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 7DP
- DP: THOMPSON, SADDLER, JOHNSON, HOLMES, MILLER, SEATON, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor