+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 40 SLA 18
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- 10:06 AM 6/11/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 279
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2018
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 279
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN3: (CED)
- NR: MICCICHE
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS
- FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: MICCICHE
- DP: COSTELLO, GARDNER
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 279
- VERSION: HB 279
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2018
- PASSED Y36 E3 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: PRUITT, GRENN, TILTON, GUTTENBERG
- DP: WILSON, GARA, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 7DP 4NR
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: STUTES, EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO
- L&C RPT 5DP
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor