+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- CORRECTED CS(RES) NT RECEIVED
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DNP: GUTTENBERG; NR: MASEK, WOLF
- DP: LYNN, HEINZE, FATE;
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 3DP 1DNP 2NR
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV) RECEIVED
- FN2: ZERO(DNR) RECEIVED
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- FN(S): FORTHCOMING
- KERTTULA, CRAWFORD, MCGUIRE
- DP: KOHRING; NR: HOLM, ROKEBERG, FATE,
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) NT 1DP 6NR
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- RES REFERRAL ADDED AFTER O&G
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- O&G, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor