+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 275(STA) AM
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TARR, LEDOUX, SEATON, GARA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 275(STA) AM
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, TUCK
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: SPOHNHOLZ, STUTES, KELLER, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 7DP
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor