+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 41 SLA 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- 10:06 AM 6/11/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 274
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 274
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- FN2: (CED)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP
- DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, GARDNER
- FN1: (CED)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/7/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 274
- PASSED Y38 E1 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 274
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- FIN RPT 7DP 3NR
- DP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
- NR: PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, TILTON
- FN1: (CED)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- L&C RPT 7DP
- DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP, KITO
- FN1: (CED)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/18
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor