+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/30/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/26 CHAPTER 23 SLA 93
On May 6, 1993 in the House:
- 12:50 PM 5/6/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 24, 1993 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 272
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES 3CAL 1NR 4/24/93
On April 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DCED)
- L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
On April 16, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- LABOR & COMMERCE
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y33 N3 E1 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 272
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/93
On April 13, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 4/13/93
- DP: PARNELL, BROWN, FOSTER
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, HANLEY, MARTIN
- FIN RPT 7DP
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor