+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:15 AM 6/16/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 105 SLA 03
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 271(FIN)(EFD AM)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
- PASSED Y11 N9
- READ THIRD TIME CSHB 271(FIN)(EFD AM)
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- AM: BUNDE
- FIN RPT 3DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, STEVENS B;
- DNP: OLSON; NR: TAYLOR, HOFFMAN;
- FN3: (REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/21 CALENDAR
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 271(FIN)(EFD AM)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y30 N6 E4
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N13 E4
- RESCIND FAILING RECON Y25 N11 E4
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION FAILED Y19 N17 E4
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RESCIND MOTION WITHDRAWN
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/17/03
- IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y22 N15 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N9 E3
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- READ THIRD TIME CSHB 271(FIN)(EFD AM)
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N22 E3
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM TO AM 2 FAILED Y12 N22 E3 A3
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2003
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N25 E3 A3
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- DP: KOTT; DNP: BERKOWITZ; NR: MORGAN,
- RLS RPT CS(FIN) NT 1DP 1DNP 2NR 2AM
- FN2: (REV)
- COGHILL; AM: MCGUIRE, ROKEBERG
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: (REV)
- WHITAKER, FOSTER; AM: MOSES
- WILLIAMS; DNP: CROFT; NR: CHENAULT,
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, HARRIS,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 1DNP 3NR 1AM
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (REV)
- DNP: KOHRING
- GRUENBERG, WHITAKER, HAWKER;
- DP: MOSES, HEINZE, WILSON, WEYHRAUCH,
- W&M RPT CS(W&M) NT 7DP 1DNP
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- W&M, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor