+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 15, 1999 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 23 SLA 99
On April 30, 1999 in the House:
- 9:25 AM 4/30/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 27, 1999 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 4/26/99
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 27(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- HOUSE INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- PETE KELLY, ADAMS, LEMAN, WILKEN, DONLEY
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, PHILLIPS, GREEN,
- FIN RPT SCS 9DP SAME TITLE
On March 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- HOUSE INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- DP: PETE KELLY
- NR: MILLER, WILKEN, PEARCE, ELTON
- HES RPT 1DP 4NR
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KEMPLEN
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 27(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/99
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, BUNDE, KOHRING,
- FIN RPT CS(HES) NT 7DP 4NR
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 2/8/99
- DAVIS, WILLIAMS, FOSTER; NR: AUSTERMAN,
- DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, MOSES
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- KEMPLEN; NR: BRICE
- DP: MORGAN, DYSON, COGHILL, WHITAKER,
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 5DP 1NR
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/99