+ − Summary
+ − Actions (35)
On May 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP
On May 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/96
- HELD TO 5/7/96
On April 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 2NR 1DNP NEW TITLE
- SCR 31 AUTHORIZES CHANGE OF TITLE
- FISCAL NOTE TO SCS (REV)
On May 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
On May 5, 1995 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N14
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y38 N2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 4, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 269(FIN)
- PASSED Y29 N11
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- MACLEAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/03/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/04 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
On April 27, 1995 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 1DP 6NR 1AM
- DP: FOSTER
- NR: HANLEY, MULDER, THERRIAULT, NAVARRE
- NR: KELLY, KOHRING
- AM: PARNELL
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV) 4/3/95
On April 3, 1995 in the House:
- STA RPT 7DP
- DP: JAMES, WILLIS, ROBINSON, IVAN, OGAN
- DP: GREEN, PORTER
- FISCAL NOTE (REVENUE)
On March 29, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE