+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 3, 2006 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/30/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/1 CHAPTER 49 SLA 06
On May 22, 2006 in the House:
- 2:32 PM 5/19/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 268(JUD)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 268(JUD)
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
On May 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: FRENCH, GUESS, THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- DP: SEEKINS
- JUD RPT 1DP 4NR
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: THERRIAULT
- DP: HUGGINS, COWDERY
- TRA RPT 2DP 1NR
On May 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, JUD
On April 29, 2005 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
- PASSED Y32 E2 A6
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 268(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2005
- VERSION: CSHB 268(JUD)
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 4NR
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- DP: GRUENBERG, ANDERSON, MCGUIRE;
- NR: KOTT, DAHLSTROM, COGHILL, GARA
On April 21, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: SALMON, THOMAS, ELKINS
- DP: GATTO;
- TRA RPT 1DP 3NR
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- TRA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor