+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 6, 2008 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 68 SLA 08
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/2/08
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- 3:05 PM 5/14/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 268
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 268
On April 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE
- NR: THERRIAULT
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/21/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 268
- PASSED Y35 E2 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 268
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- JUD RPT 1DP 4NR 1AM
- DP: RAMRAS
- NR: DOOGAN, COGHILL, DAHLSTROM, SAMUELS
- AM: HOLMES
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/08