+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 9:15 AM 6/10/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 71 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/12/03
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 267(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 267(FIN)
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, STEVENS B;
- NR: OLSON, HOFFMAN; AM: BUNDE
- FN1: (CED)
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 267(FIN)
- PASSED Y35 E1 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, WOLF, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 267(FIN)
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, KERTTULA,
- BERKOWITZ, CHENAULT, WHITAKER, FOSTER,
- HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- FN1: (CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 3DP 4NR 1AM
- DP: LYNN, WOLF, FATE; NR: MORGAN,
- MASEK, KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG; AM: GATTO
- FN1: (CED)
On April 25, 2003 in the House:
- O&G RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: HOLM, MCGUIRE, FATE, CRAWFORD,
- KOHRING; NR: KERTTULA
- FN1: (CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- O&G, RES, FIN