+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- 1:25 PM 6/7/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 78 SLA 96
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/18/96
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On April 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 265(FSH)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- ZHAROFF NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N7 E1
- THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
On April 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP 1NR
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DEC, F&G)
On March 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 265(FSH)
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(FSH) 7DP
- DP: KOTT, AUSTERMAN, OGAN, WILLIAMS
- DP: GREEN, LONG, DAVIES
- 2 ZERO FNS (DEC, F&G) 2/26/96
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 2DP 2NR
- DP: ELTON, G.DAVIS
- NR: AUSTERMAN, OGAN
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (F&G, DEC)
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FSH, RESOURCES
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor