+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/5/94
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/6 CHAPTER 7 SLA 94
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- 10:05 AM 3/21/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N1 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y16 N1 E1 A2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TAYLOR
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 263
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 3/15/94 CALENDAR
- RULES RPT 3CAL 1NR 3/14/94
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DCRA)
- STA RPT 1DP 2NR
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y39 N1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 263
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/94
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- CRA RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: SANDERS, BUNDE, DAVIES, WILLIS
- DP: WILLIAMS, TOOHEY
- NR: OLBERG
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCRA) 1/27/94
On January 10, 1994 in the House:
- CRA
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE
On April 12, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On March 29, 1993 in the House:
- COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)