+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/4/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/6 CHAPTER 113 SLA 14
- 11:58 AM 7/31/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/4/14
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 A1
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
On April 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS, OLSON, STEVENS, FRENCH, KELLY, DYSON,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 263(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH, STEDMAN, MEYER
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 263(FIN)
On April 20, 2014 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/19/14
- FN2: (DHS)
- MEMO REGARDING FISCAL NOTE CORRECTION ON FIN CMTE REPORT
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DHS)
- NR: DUNLEAVY
- DP: KELLY, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DHS)
- DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, MEYER
- HSS RPT 3DP
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 263(HSS)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, TARR, KITO III, KAWASAKI, LEDOUX
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 263(HSS)
- PASSED Y34 E4 A1 V1
- TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, MILLETT, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON, T.WILSON, GRUENBERG,
- KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, GUTTENBERG
- FN1: (DHS)
- STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, GARA, COSTELLO,
- FIN RPT CS(HSS) NT 10DP
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: (DHS)
- DP: SEATON, REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 7DP
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor