+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/12
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/28 CHAPTER 47 SLA 12
- 1:22 PM 5/24/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 261(FIN)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 261(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012
On April 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 261(FIN)
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, MUNOZ, JOHANSEN, HERRON, CISSNA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 261(FIN)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP 1AM
- DP: GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, STOLTZE,
- THOMAS
- AM: FAIRCLOUGH
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS, GARA, AUSTERMAN
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: PRUITT, KAWASAKI
- DP: MILLER, AUSTERMAN, HERRON, THOMPSON
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 4DP 2NR
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- FSH, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/12
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor