+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- NR: OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, DYSON
- FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
- FN1: (ADM)
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: (ADM)
- AM: BUNDE
- NR: STEVENS
- DP: MCGUIRE, FRENCH, GREEN
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N22 E3 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHB 260(STA)
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N7 E3 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/6/2008
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 260(STA)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- PASSED Y28 N7 E5
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- DNP: STOLTZE, KELLY
- DP: CRAWFORD, NELSON
- FIN RPT CS(STA) 2DP 2DNP 4NR 1AM
- NR: GARA, THOMAS, MEYER, CHENAULT
- AM: HAWKER
- FN1: (ADM)
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: (ADM)
- AM: COGHILL, DOLL
- NR: JOHNSON, JOHANSEN, LYNN
- DP: ROSES
- STA RPT CS(STA) 1DP 3NR 2AM
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS