+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/15/04
- 1:55 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/14 CHAPTER 56 SLA 04
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 N2 A3
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 260(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 260(JUD)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- DYSON
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BUNDE, STEVENS G,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2004
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- NR: THERRIAULT
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, OGAN;
- JUD RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- DP: DYSON, WILKEN; AM: GREEN, GUESS
- HES RPT SCS 2DP 2AM SAME TITLE
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 260(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- LYNN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y31 N4 E2 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 260(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP
- SAMUELS, MCGUIRE
- DP: HOLM, GARA, OGG, GRUENBERG,
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- ANDERSON
- CRAWFORD,GUTTENBERG, DAHLSTROM,
- NR: LYNN, ROKEBERG; AM: GATTO,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2NR 5AM
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS