+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 27, 1995 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/26 CHAPTER 12 SLA 95
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/25/95
On April 13, 1995 in the House:
- 4:34 PM 4/12/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- LEMAN, TAYLOR, RIEGER
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DONLEY, KELLY,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 26(JUD)
On April 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- THIRD RDG 4/10/95 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG FLD Y12 N7 E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/95
On March 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
- HOUSE ZERO FNS (DPS, LAW)
- ZERO FN (COURT)
On March 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FNS (LAW, DPS)
- HOUSE FN (COURT)
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 13, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/13/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y37 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 26(JUD)
- RECON NOTICE WITHDRAWN
- COSPONSOR(S): TOOHEY, ROBINSON, HANLEY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PARNELL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- 2 ZERO FNS (DPS, LAW) 1/26/95
- FISCAL NOTE (COURT) 1/26/95
- NR: FOSTER, GRUSSENDORF, BROWN
- DP: PARNELL, THERRIAULT, KOHRING, KELLY
- DP: HANLEY, MULDER, NAVARRE, MARTIN
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 8DP 3NR NEW TITLE
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- DP: B.DAVIS, PORTER
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 5DP 1NR
- DP: TOOHEY, BUNDE, GREEN
- COSPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS
- NR: FINKELSTEIN
- FISCAL NOTE (COURT)
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DPS, LAW)
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE
On January 18, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On January 16, 1995 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 6, 1995 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor