+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: KOHRING
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: (EED)
- GUTTENBERG; NR: ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- DP: GATTO, DAHLSTROM; DNP: CRAWFORD,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 2DNP 2NR
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (EED)
- DP: GATTO; AM: WILSON, OGG, SEATON
- EDU RPT CS(EDU) NT 1DP 3AM
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- EDU, L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor